E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 1/1/16
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4979
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2412
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3304
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1019
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3222
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Otto
|
Journal Page: 3222
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3221
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 2917
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2917
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/8/15 12:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 751
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 751
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|