House | 05/14/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3541 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 876 | Journal Page: 3541 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2965 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 752 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 752 | |
House | 03/10/2015 | Filed |