Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2904 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/10/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R11221 SCL-D
 By: Davis of Harris H.B. No. 2904


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to dismissal of certain actions for an asbestos-related or
 silica-related injury.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 90.010(d-1), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (d-1)  Beginning on September 1, 2014, the MDL pretrial court
 shall dismiss each action for an asbestos-related injury or a
 silica-related injury that was pending on August 31, 2005, unless a
 report was served on or after September 1, 2013, that complies with
 Section 90.003, Section 90.004, or Subsection (f).  The MDL
 pretrial court shall provide for the dismissal of such actions in a
 case management order entered for that purpose.  All such actions
 shall be dismissed on or before December [August] 31, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.