House | 05/05/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2457 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 288 | Journal Page: 2457 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1375 | |
House | 03/26/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 279 | |
House | 02/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 279 | |
House | 11/14/2014 | Filed |