Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2936 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/10/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R11416 JSC-D
 By: Sheffield H.B. No. 2936


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a pilot program for donation and redistribution of
 certain unused prescription medications; authorizing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 431, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter O to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER O. PRESCRIPTION DRUG DONATION PILOT PROGRAM
 Sec. 431.451.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Board" means the Texas  State Board of Pharmacy.
 (2)  "Charitable medical clinic" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 431.321.
 (3)  "Health center" means a federally qualified health
 center under 42 U.S.C. Section 1396d(l)(2)(B).
 (4)  "Nursing home" means a facility licensed under
 Chapter 242.
 (5)  "Pilot program" means the prescription drug
 donation pilot program under this subchapter.
 (6)  "Prescription drug" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 551.003, Occupations Code.
 Sec. 431.452.  ESTABLISHMENT OF PILOT PROGRAM. (a) The
 board shall establish a pilot program for donation and
 redistribution of prescription drugs under this subchapter.
 (b)  The board shall conduct the pilot program in Coryell,
 McLennan, and Bell Counties.
 Sec. 431.453.  DONATION OF PRESCRIPTION DRUGS. (a) Only a
 nursing home may donate prescription drugs under this subchapter.
 (b)  The donated drugs must be oral prescription drugs
 approved by the federal Food and Drug Administration that are
 sealed in the manufacturer's unopened original tamper-evident
 packaging and either individually packaged or packaged in unit-dose
 packaging.
 (c)  Donated drugs may not:
 (1)  be subject to a mandatory recall by a state or
 federal agency or a voluntary recall by a drug seller or
 manufacturer;
 (2)  be a controlled substance under Chapter 481;
 (3)  require refrigeration; or
 (4)  expire less than 60 days after the date of
 donation.
 Sec. 431.454.  ACCEPTING DONATIONS. (a) A health center may
 accept a drug donated under this subchapter.
 (b)  A health center may dispense or administer the drugs to
 the health center's patients or distribute the drugs to another
 health center or a charitable medical clinic.
 (c)  Before the health center may dispense, administer, or
 distribute the drugs, a licensed pharmacist must determine that the
 drugs are of acceptable integrity.
 Sec. 431.455.  DISPENSING OR ADMINISTERING DONATED DRUGS.
 (a) Donated drugs may be dispensed or administered by a health
 center or a charitable medical clinic.
 (b)  A prescription drug dispensed or administered to a
 patient under the pilot program must be prescribed by a physician
 for use by that patient.
 Sec. 431.456.  FEES. A health center or charitable medical
 clinic may charge only a nominal handling fee for distributing,
 dispensing, or administering a drug under the pilot program.
 Sec. 431.457.  RESALE PROHIBITED. A health center or
 charitable medical clinic may not resell donated drugs.
 Sec. 431.458.  DATABASE OF DONATED DRUGS. The board shall
 establish and maintain an electronic database in which:
 (1)  each health center shall list the name and
 quantity of each drug donated to the health center under the pilot
 program that has been verified by a pharmacist; and
 (2)  a health center or charitable medical clinic may
 search for and request donated drugs from a health center that
 possesses those drugs.
 Sec. 431.459.  RULES. The board shall adopt rules for
 implementation of this subchapter.
 Sec. 431.460.  LIMITATION ON LIABILITY. A participant in
 the pilot program is not civilly or criminally liable or subject to
 disciplinary action for harm caused by distributing, accepting,
 dispensing, or administering drugs under the pilot program unless
 the harm is caused by wilful or wanton acts of negligence, conscious
 indifference to or reckless disregard for the safety of others, or
 intentional conduct.
 Sec. 431.461.  REPORTS TO LEGISLATURE. Not later than
 January 1 of each odd-numbered year, the board shall report to the
 legislature on the results of the pilot program. The report must
 include:
 (1)  the program's efficacy in expanding access to
 prescription medications;
 (2)  an evaluation of the program's database and system
 of distribution;
 (3)  any health and safety issues posed by accepting
 and dispensing donated drugs;
 (4)  recommendations on improvements to the program;
 and
 (5)  an evaluation of potential expansion of the
 program.
 Sec. 431.462.  EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires
 September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  (a) The Texas State Board of Pharmacy shall adopt
 any necessary rules and establish the database required by
 Subchapter O, Chapter 431, Health and Safety Code, as added by this
 Act, not later than December 1, 2015.
 (b)  A nursing home, federally qualified health center, or
 charitable medical clinic may donate, distribute, accept,
 administer, or dispense a prescription drug under the pilot program
 under Subchapter O, Chapter 431, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act, on or after January 1, 2016.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.