E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2862
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5177
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5178
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1650
|
Journal Page: 5177
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5177
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4811
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2348
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2348
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2348
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2347
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2347
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2347
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2347
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1843
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1509
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#858
|
Journal Page: 2988
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2988
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2988
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2957
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2957
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1471
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 756
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 756
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|