House | 05/14/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3512 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 1057 | Journal Page: 3512 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2559 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 757 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 757 | |
House | 03/10/2015 | Filed |