Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2404
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1536
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1536
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1465
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3112
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2901
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#813
|
Journal Page: 2901
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2901
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2900
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2790
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Amended
|
4-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 2789
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2787
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 757
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 757
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|