Senate | 05/05/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1335 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1335 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1253 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2451 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2285 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Record vote | RV#502 | Journal Page: 2285 |
House | 05/01/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2285 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2285 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2225 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2225 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1944 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 279 | |
House | 02/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 279 | |
House | 11/14/2014 | Filed |