Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3024 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guerra (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 3024
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 20, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 EltifeX
 CreightonX
 EllisX
 HuffinesX
 SchwertnerX
 SeligerX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 WatsonX
 WhitmireX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to coordination of dental benefits under certain insurance
 policies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 1203, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter B to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER B. DENTAL INSURANCE
 Sec. 1203.051.  APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER; EXCEPTION. (a)
 This subchapter applies only to an insurance policy that provides
 benefits for dental expenses, including, except as provided by
 Subsection (b), an individual, group, blanket, or franchise
 insurance policy or insurance agreement, or a group hospital
 service contract, that is offered by:
 (1)  an insurance company;
 (2)  a group hospital service corporation operating
 under Chapter 842;
 (3)  a fraternal benefit society operating under
 Chapter 885;
 (4)  a stipulated premium company operating under
 Chapter 884;
 (5)  a reciprocal exchange operating under Chapter 942;
 or
 (6)  a Lloyd's plan operating under Chapter 941.
 (b)  This subchapter does not apply to a separate dental
 policy that exclusively provides a non-coordinated, fixed
 indemnity benefit, regardless of expenses incurred paid directly to
 the policyholder or to the provider under an assignment of benefits
 provision.
 Sec. 1203.052.  COORDINATION OF BENEFITS BETWEEN PRIMARY AND
 SECONDARY INSURERS. (a) This section applies if:
 (1)  an insured is covered by at least two different
 insurance policies; and
 (2)  each policy provides the insured dental benefits.
 (b)  The primary insurer, as determined under a coordination
 of benefits provision applicable to the policies, is responsible
 for dental expenses covered under the insurance policy issued by
 the primary insurer up to the full amount of any policy limit
 applicable to the covered dental expenses.
 (c)  Before the policy limit described by Subsection (b) is
 reached, the secondary insurer, as determined under a coordination
 of benefits provision applicable to the policies, is responsible
 only for dental expenses covered under the insurance policy issued
 by the secondary insurer that are not covered under the policy
 issued by the primary insurer.
 (d)  After the policy limit described by Subsection (b) has
 been reached, the secondary insurer, in addition to the
 responsibility described by Subsection (c), is responsible for any
 dental expenses covered by both policies that exceed the policy
 limit described by Subsection (b), not to exceed the policy limit of
 the secondary policy.
 Sec. 1203.053.  CERTAIN COORDINATION OF BENEFITS PROVISIONS
 PROHIBITED. An insurance policy subject to this subchapter may not
 be delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed in this state if:
 (1)  a provision of the policy excludes or reduces the
 payment of benefits for dental expenses to or on behalf of an
 insured;
 (2)  the reason for the exclusion or reduction is that
 dental benefits are payable or have been paid to or on behalf of the
 insured under another insurance policy; and
 (3)  the exclusion or reduction would apply before the
 full amount of the dental expenses incurred by the insured and
 covered by both policies have been paid or reimbursed or the full
 amount of the applicable policy limit of the policy containing the
 exclusion or reduction is reached.
 Sec. 1203.054.  CERTAIN COORDINATION OF BENEFITS PROVISIONS
 VOID. A provision of an insurance policy that violates Section
 1203.053 is void.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 1203, Insurance Code, is amended by
 designating Sections 1203.001 through 1203.003 as Subchapter A and
 adding a subchapter heading to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER A. SUPPLEMENTAL INSURANCE POLICIES
 SECTION 3.  Section 1203.001, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1203.001.  APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER [CHAPTER]. (a)
 This subchapter [chapter] applies only to:
 (1)  a policy of group accident and health insurance as
 described by Chapter 1251;
 (2)  a policy of blanket accident and health insurance
 as described by Chapter 1251;
 (3)  a policy of individual accident and health
 insurance as defined by Section 1201.001; or
 (4)  an evidence of coverage as defined by Section
 843.002.
 (b)  This subchapter [chapter] does not apply to an
 individual accident and health insurance policy that is designed to
 fully integrate with other policies through a variable deductible.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an insurance policy that is delivered, issued for delivery, or
 renewed on or after January 1, 2016. A policy delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2016, is governed by the law
 as it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *