Senate | 05/20/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1390 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1390 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1349 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2676 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Record vote | RV#607 | Journal Page: 2496 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2496 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2496 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2417 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2417 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Amended | 1-Murphy | Journal Page: 2417 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2417 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 902 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 902 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Filed |