House | 05/11/2015 | Postponed | 6/1/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3056 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3055 | |
House | 05/09/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#686 | Journal Page: 2680 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2343 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 902 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 902 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Filed |