House | 05/12/2015 | Postponed | 7/4/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3213 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3213 | |
House | 05/09/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#686 | Journal Page: 2680 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 957 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 957 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Filed |