Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3043 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Garcia) H.B. No. 3043
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 14, 2015;
3- May 15, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
4- and Commerce; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following
5- vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 3043
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to the licensing and regulation of a journeyman lineman.
126 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
137 SECTION 1. Section 1305.002(12), Occupations Code, is
148 amended to read as follows:
159 (12) "Journeyman lineman" means an individual who
1610 engages in electrical work involving the installation,
1711 maintenance, and operation of equipment associated with the
1812 transmission and distribution of electricity from the
1913 electricity's original source to a substation and from a substation
2014 to the point where the electricity enters a building or structure on
2115 a customer's premises for further distribution.
2216 SECTION 2. Section 1305.101(a), Occupations Code, is
2317 amended to read as follows:
2418 (a) The executive director or commission, as appropriate,
2519 shall:
2620 (1) by rule establish the financial responsibility
2721 requirements for electrical contractors; [and]
2822 (2) after publication of the National Electrical Code
2923 by the National Fire Protection Association every three years,
3024 adopt the revised National Electrical Code as the electrical code
3125 for the state; and
3226 (3) after the publication of the National Electrical
3327 Safety Code by the Institute of Electrical and Electronics
3428 Engineers every five years, adopt the revised National Electrical
3529 Safety Code for purposes of Section 1305.162(e).
3630 SECTION 3. Section 1305.162, Occupations Code, is amended
3731 by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
3832 (e) In addition to the other requirements of this section,
3933 the department shall accept, develop, or contract for a journeyman
4034 lineman examination that tests an applicant's knowledge of:
4135 (1) materials and methods used in the installation,
4236 maintenance, and operation of equipment associated with the
4337 transmission and distribution of electricity from the
4438 electricity's original source to a substation and from a substation
4539 to the point where the electricity enters a building or structure on
4640 a customer's premises for further distribution; and
4741 (2) the standards prescribed by the National
4842 Electrical Safety Code as adopted by the commission.
4943 SECTION 4. Section 1305.162(e), Occupations Code, as added
5044 by this Act, applies only to an examination for a journeyman lineman
5145 license administered on or after June 1, 2016. An examination for a
5246 journeyman lineman license administered before that date is
5347 governed by the law in effect on the date the examination was
5448 administered, and the former law is continued in effect for that
5549 purpose.
5650 SECTION 5. Not later than March 1, 2016, the Texas
5751 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt rules necessary
5852 to implement Sections 1305.101(a)(3) and 1305.162(e), Occupations
5953 Code, as added by this Act.
6054 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
61- * * * * *
55+ ______________________________ ______________________________
56+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
57+ I certify that H.B. No. 3043 was passed by the House on May
58+ 13, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 124, Nays 21, 2 present, not
59+ voting.
60+ ______________________________
61+ Chief Clerk of the House
62+ I certify that H.B. No. 3043 was passed by the Senate on May
63+ 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
64+ ______________________________
65+ Secretary of the Senate
66+ APPROVED: _____________________
67+ Date
68+ _____________________
69+ Governor