House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 903 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 903 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Filed |