E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 134
|
Journal Page: 3508
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 134
|
Journal Page: 4432
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4020
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1282
|
Journal Page: 4020
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4020
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3905
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1612
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1337
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1337
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1259
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2451
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#448
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 904
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 904
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|