LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD Austin, Texas FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION April 15, 2015 TO: Honorable Richard Peña Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE:HB3092 by Rose (Relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide protective services to certain persons determined to be at risk of future harm from abuse, neglect, or exploitation.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated. The bill would amend the Human Resources Code to require the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) to implement a pilot program to evaluate the feasibility and any associated benefits of providing protective services to elderly or disabled persons in imminent risk of abuse, neglect, or exploitation based on certain risk assessment criteria. DFPS would be required to implement the pilot by January 1, 2016 and is authorized to continue the pilot through August 31, 2017. The bill requires DFPS to submit a report of preliminary findings by December 15, 2016 and any additional findings by December 15, 2017.DFPS and the Health and Human Services Commission do not anticipate any significant fiscal impacts as a result of complying with the provisions of the bill. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated. Source Agencies:530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 529 Health and Human Services Commission LBB Staff: UP, NB, WP, SJ, VJC LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD Austin, Texas FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION April 15, 2015 TO: Honorable Richard Peña Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE:HB3092 by Rose (Relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide protective services to certain persons determined to be at risk of future harm from abuse, neglect, or exploitation.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted TO: Honorable Richard Peña Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE: HB3092 by Rose (Relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide protective services to certain persons determined to be at risk of future harm from abuse, neglect, or exploitation.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted Honorable Richard Peña Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services Honorable Richard Peña Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board HB3092 by Rose (Relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide protective services to certain persons determined to be at risk of future harm from abuse, neglect, or exploitation.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted HB3092 by Rose (Relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide protective services to certain persons determined to be at risk of future harm from abuse, neglect, or exploitation.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated. No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated. The bill would amend the Human Resources Code to require the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) to implement a pilot program to evaluate the feasibility and any associated benefits of providing protective services to elderly or disabled persons in imminent risk of abuse, neglect, or exploitation based on certain risk assessment criteria. DFPS would be required to implement the pilot by January 1, 2016 and is authorized to continue the pilot through August 31, 2017. The bill requires DFPS to submit a report of preliminary findings by December 15, 2016 and any additional findings by December 15, 2017.DFPS and the Health and Human Services Commission do not anticipate any significant fiscal impacts as a result of complying with the provisions of the bill. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated. Source Agencies: 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 529 Health and Human Services Commission 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 529 Health and Human Services Commission LBB Staff: UP, NB, WP, SJ, VJC UP, NB, WP, SJ, VJC