Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3092 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Rose, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 3092
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
3- May 15, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
4- and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the
5- following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 3092
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide
126 protective services to certain persons determined to be at risk of
137 future harm from abuse, neglect, or exploitation.
148 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
159 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 48, Human Resources Code,
1610 is amended by adding Section 48.212 to read as follows:
1711 Sec. 48.212. PILOT PROGRAM TO PROVIDE PROTECTIVE SERVICES
1812 TO PERSONS AT RISK OF FUTURE HARM. (a) Notwithstanding any other
1913 law, including Section 48.002(a)(5), the department shall, using
2014 existing resources, develop and implement a pilot program that
2115 evaluates the feasibility and associated benefits of providing
2216 protective services when an elderly person or person with a
2317 disability has been determined, using criteria developed under
2418 Section 48.004, to be at risk of future harm from abuse, neglect, or
2519 exploitation, but who is not in a state of abuse, neglect, or
2620 exploitation.
2721 (b) Section 48.1523 does not apply to reports considered
2822 under the pilot program developed under this section.
2923 (c) The department may terminate the pilot program if the
3024 executive commissioner determines the termination is appropriate.
3125 The pilot program terminates August 31, 2017, unless the program is
3226 terminated before that date in accordance with this subsection.
3327 (d) This section expires September 1, 2019.
3428 SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2016, the Department of
3529 Family and Protective Services shall develop and implement the
3630 pilot program required under Section 48.212, Human Resources Code,
3731 as added by this Act.
3832 SECTION 3. (a) Not later than December 15, 2016, the
3933 Department of Family and Protective Services shall prepare and
4034 issue a report of preliminary findings from the pilot program
4135 required under Section 48.212, Human Resources Code, as added by
4236 this Act, to the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the
4337 standing legislative committees with primary jurisdiction over
4438 health and human services.
4539 (b) Not later than December 15, 2017, the Department of
4640 Family and Protective Services shall submit a final report on the
4741 pilot program to the persons and entities described under
4842 Subsection (a) of this section. The report must include:
4943 (1) an evaluation of the feasibility and benefits of
5044 the pilot program;
5145 (2) any additional findings the department determines
5246 appropriate; and
5347 (3) recommendations for the continuation,
5448 elimination, or expansion of the pilot program.
5549 SECTION 4. If before implementing any provision of this Act
5650 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
5751 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
5852 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
5953 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
6054 waiver or authorization is granted.
6155 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
62- * * * * *
56+ ______________________________ ______________________________
57+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
58+ I certify that H.B. No. 3092 was passed by the House on April
59+ 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 132, Nays 7, 1 present, not
60+ voting.
61+ ______________________________
62+ Chief Clerk of the House
63+ I certify that H.B. No. 3092 was passed by the Senate on May
64+ 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 3.
65+ ______________________________
66+ Secretary of the Senate
67+ APPROVED: _____________________
68+ Date
69+ _____________________
70+ Governor