Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3092 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/13/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rose H.B. No. 3092


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to developing and maintaining risk assessment criteria for
 use by department personnel in determining whether an elderly or
 disabled person is in imminent risk of abuse.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 48.004, Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 48.004.  RISK ASSESSMENT. (a) The executive
 commissioner by rule shall develop and maintain risk assessment
 criteria for use by department personnel in determining whether an
 elderly or disabled person is in imminent risk of abuse, neglect, or
 exploitation or in a state of abuse, neglect, or exploitation and
 needs protective services.  The criteria must:
 (1)  provide for a comprehensive assessment of the
 person's:
 (A)  environmental, physical, medical, mental
 health, and financial condition;
 (B)  social interaction and support; and
 (C)  need for legal intervention; and
 (2)  specify the circumstances under which a caseworker
 must consult with a supervisor regarding a case.
 (b)  Notwithstanding section 48.002(a)(5), the department
 shall, out of funds appropriated, implement a pilot program to
 evaluate the feasibility and any associated benefits of providing
 protective services when an elderly or disabled person has been
 determined to be at risk of future harm from abuse, neglect, or
 exploitation using the risk assessment criteria described in
 subsection (a). The provision of protective services in an area in
 which the pilot has been implemented does not require that an
 elderly or disabled person be in a state of abuse, neglect, or
 exploitation.
 Section 2.  The department shall implement the pilot program
 described in section 48.004(b), Human Resources Code, not later
 than January 1, 2016 and may be conducted through August 31, 2017.
 DFPS shall submit a report of preliminary findings from the program
 to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and appropriate legislative
 committees having oversight over the Adult Protective Services
 division not later than December 15, 2016 and on any additional
 findings not later than December 15, 2017.
 Section 3.  Subsection (b), section 48.004, Human Resources
 Code, expires August 31, 2017.
 Section 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.