Senate | 05/15/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1624 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1624 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3548 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3292 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Record vote | RV#1005 | Journal Page: 3291 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3291 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3291 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3207 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3207 | |
House | 05/09/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#686 | Journal Page: 2680 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2063 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 906 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 906 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Filed |