House | 05/07/2015 | Returned to committee | Journal Page: 2741 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Point of order sustained | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) | Journal Page: 2740 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2740 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2112 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | Journal Page: 972 | |
House | 03/24/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 972 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Filed |