Senate | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1197 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2268 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Record vote | RV#428 | Journal Page: 2071 |
House | 04/29/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2071 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2071 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2036 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Record vote | RV#419 | Journal Page: 2035 |
House | 04/28/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2035 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Amendment adopted as amended | 2-D. Bonnen | Journal Page: 2035 |
House | 04/28/2015 | Amendment amended | 5-Y. Davis | Journal Page: 2035 |
House | 04/28/2015 | Vote reconsidered | 2-D. Bonnen | Journal Page: 2035 |
House | 04/28/2015 | Amendment tabled | 4-Howard | Journal Page: 2034 |
House | 04/28/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | 2-D. Bonnen | Journal Page: 2032 |
House | 04/28/2015 | Amended | 1-D. Bonnen | Journal Page: 2032 |
House | 04/28/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2032 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Record vote | RV#367 | Journal Page: 1914 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Calendars Committee rule adopted | Journal Page: 1914 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 715 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 715 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Filed |