E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3600
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3600
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5708
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1761
|
Journal Page: 5708
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5708
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5708
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6021
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3493
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3493
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1055
|
Journal Page: 3490
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3409
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4084
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4084
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1757
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1757
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3781
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3781
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 3781
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3574
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1622
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1622
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1622
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1622
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1622
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1622
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1622
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1504
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1259
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#494
|
Journal Page: 2276
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2276
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
5-Elkins
|
Journal Page: 2275
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Amended
|
4-Flynn, D. Bonnen, Goldman, Simpson, C. Anderson, S. Turner, Krause, Collier, and Price
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
3-Elkins
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2273
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2201
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Amendment as amended withdrawn
|
2-Gonzales
|
Journal Page: 2201
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2201
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
2-Gonzales
|
Journal Page: 2194
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
4-McClendon
|
Journal Page: 2194
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#476
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
3-Gonzales
|
Journal Page: 2192
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-Gonzales
|
Journal Page: 2192
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Howard
|
Journal Page: 2191
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2191
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1746
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 907
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 907
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|