Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3132 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Parker (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 3132
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 15, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 EltifeX
 CreightonX
 EllisX
 HuffinesX
 SchwertnerX
 SeligerX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 WatsonX
 WhitmireX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility requirements to act as a financial adviser
 or investment adviser in relation to certain public securities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1371.154(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  To be eligible to be a financial adviser or an
 investment adviser under this subchapter, the adviser must:
 (1)  be registered:
 (A)  as a dealer or investment adviser in
 accordance with Section 12 or 12-1, The Securities Act (Article
 581-12 or 581-12-1, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes); [or]
 (B)  with the United States Securities and
 Exchange Commission under the Investment Advisers Act of 1940 (15
 U.S.C. Section 80b-1 et seq.), if the adviser is providing advice on
 the investment of bond proceeds and not on the issuance of a public
 security or an interest rate management agreement; or
 (C)  with the United States Securities and
 Exchange Commission as a municipal advisor under Section 15B,
 Securities Exchange Act of 1934 (15 U.S.C. Section 78o-4);
 (2)  have relevant experience in providing advice to
 issuers in connection with:
 (A)  the issuance of public securities;
 (B)  the valuation of interest rate management
 agreements; or
 (C)  the investment of public security proceeds;
 and
 (3)  acknowledge in writing to the issuer that in
 connection with the transaction for which the adviser is providing
 advice the adviser:
 (A)  is acting as the issuer's agent; and
 (B)  has complied with the requirements of this
 subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *