Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3160 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Alonzo, Thompson of Harris H.B. No. 3160
 (Senate Sponsor - West)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an exception to the period of filing an application for
 the grant of letters testamentary or of administration of a
 decedent's estate.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 301.002(b), Estates Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  This section does not apply if administration is
 necessary to:
 (1)  receive or recover property due a decedent's
 estate; or
 (2)  prevent real property in a decedent's estate from
 becoming a danger to the health, safety, or welfare of the general
 public and the applicant for the issuance of letters testamentary
 or of administration is a home-rule municipality that is a creditor
 of the estate.
 SECTION 2.  Section 301.151, Estates Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 301.151.  GENERAL PROOF REQUIREMENTS. An applicant for
 the issuance of letters testamentary or of administration of an
 estate must prove to the court's satisfaction that:
 (1)  the person whose estate is the subject of the
 application is dead;
 (2)  except as provided by Section 301.002(b)(2), four
 years have not elapsed since the date of the decedent's death and
 before the application;
 (3)  the court has jurisdiction and venue over the
 estate;
 (4)  citation has been served and returned in the
 manner and for the period required by this title; and
 (5)  the person for whom letters testamentary or of
 administration are sought is entitled by law to the letters and is
 not disqualified.
 SECTION 3.  Section 306.002(c), Estates Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  The court may find other instances of necessity for an
 administration based on proof before the court, but a necessity is
 considered to exist if:
 (1)  there are two or more debts against the estate;
 (2)  there is a desire for the county court to partition
 the estate among the distributees; [or]
 (3)  the administration is necessary to receive or
 recover funds or other property due the estate; or
 (4)  the administration is necessary to prevent real
 property in a decedent's estate from becoming a danger to the
 health, safety, or welfare of the general public.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an application for the grant of letters testamentary or of
 administration of a decedent's estate filed on or after the
 effective date of this Act.  An application for the grant of letters
 testamentary or of administration of a decedent's estate filed
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the application was filed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *