Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3161 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/13/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Cyrier H.B. No. 3161


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prioritizing groundwater production.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 36.122, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 36.122.  EXPORT [TRANSFER] OF GROUNDWATER OUT OF
 DISTRICT.  (a)  Prior to exporting [If an application for a permit
 or an amendment to a permit under Section 36.113 proposes the
 transfer of] groundwater outside of a district's boundaries, the
 exporting person must first obtain a permit from the district-[may
 also consider the provisions of this section in determining whether
 to grant or deny the permit or permit amendment].
 (b)  A district may promulgate rules requiring a person to
 obtain a permit or an amendment to a permit [under Section 36.113]
 from the district for the export [transfer] of groundwater out of
 the district to:
 (1)  increase, on or after March 2, 1997, the amount of
 groundwater to be exported [transferred] under a continuing
 arrangement in effect before that date; or
 (2)  export [transfer] groundwater out of the district
 on or after March 2, 1997, under a new arrangement.
 (c)  Except as provided in Section 36.113(e) and subsection
 (l),
 the district may not impose more restrictive permit conditions
 on exporters [transporters] than the district imposes on existing
 in-district users.
 (d)  The district may impose a reasonable fee for processing
 an application under this section. The fee may not exceed fees that
 the district imposes for processing other applications under
 Section 36.113. An application filed to comply with this section
 shall be considered and processed under the same procedures as
 other applications for permits under Section 36.113 and shall be
 combined with applications filed to obtain a permit for in-district
 groundwater [water] use under Section 36.113 from the same
 applicant.
 (e)  The district may impose a reasonable fee or surcharge
 for an export fee using one of the following methods:
 (1)  a fee negotiated between the district and the
 exporter [transporter];
 (2)  a rate not to exceed the equivalent of the
 district's tax rate per hundred dollars of valuation for each
 thousand gallons of groundwater exported [water transferred] out of
 the district or 2.5 cents per thousand gallons of water, if the
 district assesses a tax rate of less than 2.5 cents per hundred
 dollars of valuation; or
 (3)  for a fee-based district, a 50 percent export
 surcharge, in addition to the district's production fee, for water
 groundwater exported [water transferred] out of the district.
 (f)  In reviewing a proposed export [transfer] of
 groundwater out of the district, the district shall consider:
 (1)  the availability of water in the district and in
 the proposed receiving area during the period for which the
 groundwater [water] supply is requested;
 (2)  the projected effect of the proposed export
 [transfer] on the district’s ability to achieve its desired future
 condition [aquifer conditions, depletion, subsidence, or effects
 on existing permit holders or other groundwater users within the
 district; and];
 (3)  factors identified in the applicable approved
 regional water plans that address the following:
 (A)  the availability of feasible and practicable
 alternative supplies in the receiving area to the groundwater
 proposed for export;
 (B)  proposed methods and efforts by the receiving
 area to avoid waste and implement water conservation and drought
 contingency measures;
 (C)  the projected economic impact reasonably
 expected to occur in each area as a result of the export;
 (4)  the information required to be submitted by the
 applicant;
 (5)  the approved regional water plan and] approved
 district management plan]; and
 (6)  if the export is based on a contractual sale of
 water, the terms of the contract, including provisions for
 conservation, drought response and waste prevention.
 (g)  The district may not deny a permit based on the fact that
 the applicant seeks to export [transfer] groundwater outside of the
 district but may limit a permit issued under this section if
 conditions in Subsection (f) warrant the limitation, subject to
 Subsection (c).
 (h)  Export permits [In addition to conditions provided by
 Section 36.1131, the permit] shall specify:
 (1)  the amount of groundwater [water] that may be
 exported [transferred] out of the district; and
 (2)  the period for which the groundwater [water] may
 be exported [transferred].
 (i)  The period specified by Subsection (h)(2) shall be:
 (1)  at least three years if construction of a
 conveyance system has not been initiated prior to the issuance of
 the permit; [or]
 (2)  at least 30 years if construction of a conveyance
 system has been initiated prior to the issuance of the permit; or
 (3)  if the export is based on a contractual sale of
 water, no greater than the term of the contract, including any
 extension or renewal of the contract.
 (j)  A term under Subsection (i)(1) shall automatically be
 extended to the terms agreed to under Subsection (i)(2) if
 construction of a conveyance system is begun before the expiration
 of the initial term.
 (k)  Notwithstanding the period specified in Subsections (i)
 and (j) during which groundwater [water] may be exported
 [transferred] under a permit, a district may periodically review
 the amount of groundwater [water] that may be transferred under the
 permit and may limit the amount if additional factors considered in
 Subsection (f) warrant the limitation, subject to Subsection (c).
 The review described by this subsection may take place not more
 frequently than the period provided for the review or renewal of
 operating [regular] permits issued by the district. In its
 determination of whether to renew a permit issued under this
 section, the district shall consider relevant and current data for
 the conservation of groundwater resources and shall consider the
 permit in the same manner it would consider any other permit in the
 district.
 (l)  Any operating permit associated with an export permit
 is junior in priority to any other operating permit issued before
 the time the application for the export permit is accepted for
 filing, and any groundwater production reductions must be applied
 to operating permits associated with an export permit before they
 may be applied to any operating permit issued before the time the
 application for the export permit was accepted for filing [A
 district is prohibited from using revenues obtained under
 Subsection (e) to prohibit the transfer of groundwater outside of a
 district. A district is not prohibited from using revenues obtained
 under Subsection (e) for paying expenses related to enforcement of
 this chapter or district rules].
 (m)  A district may not prohibit the export of groundwater if
 the purchase was in effect on or before June 1, 1997.
 (n)  This section applies only to an export [a transfer] of
 groundwater [water] that is permitted after September 1, 1997.
 (o)  A district shall adopt rules as necessary to implement
 this section but may not adopt rules expressly prohibiting the
 export of groundwater.
 (p)  Subsection (e) does not apply to a district that is
 collecting an export fee or surcharge on March 1, 2001.
 [(q)     In applying this section, a district must be fair,
 impartial, and nondiscriminatory].
 SECTION 2.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect on September 1, 2015.