Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3186 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/25/2015

                    By: Farney (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 3186
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 25, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 25, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the qualifications of directors and the use of project
 funds of certain municipal development districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 377.051, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  Notwithstanding Subsection (d), a person may qualify to
 serve as a director of a district that is located in a municipality
 with a population of more than 5,000 and less than 6,000 and that is
 located wholly in a county with a population of more than 20,000 and
 less than 25,000 and that borders the Brazos River if the person
 resides in the independent school district that serves the majority
 of the district.
 SECTION 2.  Section 377.072, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (e) to
 read as follows:
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsections [Subsection] (d) and
 (e), the district may use money in the development project fund only
 to:
 (1)  pay the costs of planning, acquiring,
 establishing, developing, constructing, or renovating one or more
 development projects in the district;
 (2)  pay the principal of, interest on, and other costs
 relating to bonds or other obligations issued by the district or to
 refund bonds or other obligations; or
 (3)  pay the costs of operating or maintaining one or
 more development projects during the planning, acquisition,
 establishment, development, construction, or renovation or while
 bonds or other obligations for the planning, acquisition,
 establishment, development, construction, or renovation are
 outstanding.
 (e)  A district that is located in a municipality with a
 population of more than 5,000 and less than 6,000 and that is
 located wholly in a county with a population of more than 20,000 and
 less than 25,000 and that borders the Brazos River may use money in
 the development project fund only to:
 (1)  pay the costs of planning, acquiring,
 establishing, developing, constructing, or renovating one or more
 development projects inside the county in which the district is
 located, if the project:
 (A)  accomplishes a public purpose of the
 district;
 (B)  allows the district to retain control over
 the money to ensure that the district's public purpose is
 accomplished and to protect the district's investment; and
 (C)  benefits the district;
 (2)  pay the principal of, interest on, and other costs
 relating to bonds or other obligations issued by the district or to
 refund bonds or other obligations; or
 (3)  pay the costs of operating or maintaining one or
 more development projects during the planning, acquisition,
 establishment, development, construction, or renovation or while
 bonds or other obligations for the planning, acquisition,
 establishment, development, construction, or renovation are
 outstanding.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *