Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3190 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Villalba (Senate Sponsor - Huffines) H.B. No. 3190
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 14, 2015;
 May 15, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain persons to direct, consent to,
 or disapprove a trustee's decisions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 114.003, Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 114.003.  POWERS TO DIRECT: CHARITABLE TRUSTS. (a) In
 this section, "charitable trust" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 123.001.
 (a-1)  The terms of a charitable trust may give a trustee or
 other person a power to direct the modification or termination of
 the trust.
 (b)  If the terms of a charitable trust give a person the
 power to direct certain actions of the trustee, the trustee shall
 act in accordance with the person's direction unless:
 (1)  the direction is manifestly contrary to the terms
 of the trust; or
 (2)  the trustee knows the direction would constitute a
 serious breach of a fiduciary duty that the person holding the power
 to direct owes to the beneficiaries of the trust.
 (c)  A person, other than a beneficiary, who holds a power to
 direct with respect to a charitable trust is presumptively a
 fiduciary required to act in good faith with regard to the purposes
 of the trust and the interests of the beneficiaries.  The holder of
 a power to direct with respect to a charitable trust is liable for
 any loss that results from a breach of the person's fiduciary duty.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 114, Property Code, is
 amended by adding Section 114.0031 to read as follows:
 Sec. 114.0031.  DIRECTED TRUSTS; ADVISORS. (a) In this
 section:
 (1)  "Advisor" includes protector.
 (2)  "Investment decision" means, with respect to any
 investment, the retention, purchase, sale, exchange, tender, or
 other transaction affecting the ownership of the investment or
 rights in the investment and, with respect to a nonpublicly traded
 investment, the valuation of the investment.
 (b)  This section does not apply to a charitable trust as
 defined by Section 123.001.
 (c)  For purposes of this section, an advisor with authority
 with respect to investment decisions is an investment advisor.
 (d)  A protector has all the power and authority granted to
 the protector by the trust terms, which may include:
 (1)  the power to remove and appoint trustees,
 advisors, trust committee members, and other protectors;
 (2)  the power to modify or amend the trust terms to
 achieve favorable tax status or to facilitate the efficient
 administration of the trust; and
 (3)  the power to modify, expand, or restrict the terms
 of a power of appointment granted to a beneficiary by the trust
 terms.
 (e)  If the terms of a trust give a person the authority to
 direct, consent to, or disapprove a trustee's actual or proposed
 investment decisions, distribution decisions, or other decisions,
 the person is considered to be an advisor and a fiduciary when
 exercising that authority except that the trust terms may provide
 that an advisor acts in a nonfiduciary capacity.
 (f)  A trustee who acts in accordance with the direction of
 an advisor, as prescribed by the trust terms, is not liable, except
 in cases of wilful misconduct on the part of the trustee so
 directed, for any loss resulting directly or indirectly from that
 act.
 (g)  If the trust terms provide that a trustee must make
 decisions with the consent of an advisor, the trustee is not liable,
 except in cases of wilful misconduct or gross negligence on the part
 of the trustee, for any loss resulting directly or indirectly from
 any act taken or not taken as a result of the advisor's failure to
 provide the required consent after having been requested to do so by
 the trustee.
 (h)  If the trust terms provide that a trustee must act in
 accordance with the direction of an advisor with respect to
 investment decisions, distribution decisions, or other decisions
 of the trustee, the trustee does not, except to the extent the trust
 terms provide otherwise, have the duty to:
 (1)  monitor the conduct of the advisor;
 (2)  provide advice to the advisor or consult with the
 advisor; or
 (3)  communicate with or warn or apprise any
 beneficiary or third party concerning instances in which the
 trustee would or might have exercised the trustee's own discretion
 in a manner different from the manner directed by the advisor.
 (i)  Absent clear and convincing evidence to the contrary,
 the actions of a trustee pertaining to matters within the scope of
 the advisor's authority, such as confirming that the advisor's
 directions have been carried out and recording and reporting
 actions taken at the advisor's direction, are presumed to be
 administrative actions taken by the trustee solely to allow the
 trustee to perform those duties assigned to the trustee under the
 trust terms, and such administrative actions are not considered to
 constitute an undertaking by the trustee to monitor the advisor or
 otherwise participate in actions within the scope of the advisor's
 authority.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Except as specifically provided by a trust
 term in effect before the effective date of this Act, the changes in
 law made by this Act apply to a trust created before, on, or after
 the effective date of this Act with respect to an action taken or
 not taken on or after September 1, 2015, by a trustee or other
 person with respect to the trust.
 (b)  An action taken or not taken with respect to a trust
 before September 1, 2015, is governed by the law that applied to the
 action taken or not taken immediately before the effective date of
 this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *