Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3195 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/11/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R13265 SCL-D
 By: Bernal H.B. No. 3195


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a health care pilot program for
 low-income individuals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle C, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 65 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 65. HEALTH CARE PILOT PROGRAM FOR LOW-INCOME INDIVIDUALS
 Sec. 65.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Commissioner" means the commissioner of
 insurance.
 (2)  "Department" means the Texas Department of
 Insurance.
 (3)  "Pilot program" means the health care pilot
 program for low-income individuals established under this chapter.
 Sec. 65.002.  ESTABLISHMENT OF PILOT PROGRAM; RULEMAKING
 AUTHORITY. (a) The department shall establish and maintain in
 accordance with this chapter a pilot program for health benefits
 coverage for certain low-income individuals residing in an area
 designated by the department under Section 65.003.
 (b)  The commissioner may adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this chapter.
 Sec. 65.003.  DESIGNATION OF AREAS UNDER PILOT PROGRAM. (a)
 The commissioner by rule shall adopt standards in accordance with
 this subsection for the designation of an area to be served under
 the pilot program. To be eligible for the pilot program:
 (1)  the percentage of adults in the area who do not
 have coverage or benefits for health care services under a public or
 private plan or program must be higher than the state average;
 (2)  the area must be designated as a health
 professional shortage area by the United States Department of
 Health and Human Services; and
 (3)  the area must be served on or before January 1,
 2015, by one or more promotoras trained under Chapter 48.
 (b)  The department shall designate 10 areas in this state
 for inclusion in the pilot program in accordance with the standards
 under Subsection (a) and rules adopted under this chapter.
 (c)  The department may establish an application process to
 allow an area to apply for inclusion in the pilot program.
 Sec. 65.004.  PROMOTORA DUTIES. A promotora serving an area
 designated for the pilot program may assist the department in
 coordination of health care under the pilot program, in monitoring
 the compliance of individuals enrolled in the pilot program, and in
 establishing an application process.
 Sec. 65.005.  INDIVIDUAL ELIGIBILITY. To be eligible to
 receive services under the pilot program, an individual must have
 an income of less than 138 percent of the federal poverty level and
 be a parent of a child currently enrolled in the state health plan
 or health benefits plan for children under Chapter 62 or 63 or the
 state Medicaid program operated under Chapter 32, Human Resources
 Code.
 Sec. 65.006.  HEALTH COVERAGE UNDER PILOT PROGRAM. The
 commissioner by rule shall develop the health benefits coverage
 under the pilot program, including the benefits offered under the
 pilot program and the method of providing benefits.
 Sec. 65.007.  FUNDING. Notwithstanding Section 6(e)(2),
 Chapter 615 (S.B. 1367), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2013, the department shall fund the pilot program with
 available funds transferred to the department under that Act.  The
 commissioner may adopt rules necessary to facilitate the funding of
 the pilot program under this section.
 Sec. 65.008.  REPORT. (a) The department shall contract
 with an independent third party to evaluate the pilot program and
 develop a report under this section.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2016, the third party
 contracting with the department under Subsection (a) shall
 distribute a report that evaluates the pilot program to the
 governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of
 representatives, and chairs of the standing committees of the
 senate and house of representatives with primary jurisdiction
 regarding health care or insurance.
 Sec. 65.009.  ADVISORY COMMITTEE. The commissioner shall
 appoint an advisory committee composed of five members to advise
 the department on the implementation of this chapter. The
 committee must include:
 (1)  two individuals eligible to obtain coverage under
 the pilot program;
 (2)  a representative of the insurance industry;
 (3)  a representative of a university hospital system;
 and
 (4)  a health care provider providing services in an
 area included in the pilot program.
 Sec. 65.010.  EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER. This chapter expires
 August 31, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2016, the Texas
 Department of Insurance shall establish the indigent health care
 pilot program described by Chapter 65, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.