E
|
06/15/2015
|
Effective on 1/1/16
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6046
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3622
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 143
|
Journal Page: 5701
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2851
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5004
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5004
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1610
|
Journal Page: 5004
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5004
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2014
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2014
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2014
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2014
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2014
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 2014
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Huffines
|
Journal Page: 2012
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2012
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2012
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1218
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2268
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2073
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#429
|
Journal Page: 2073
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2073
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Otto
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#423
|
Journal Page: 2054
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2054
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2052
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
10-Howard
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Amendment as amended tabled
|
8-Smithee
|
Journal Page: 2049
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
9-Smithee
|
Journal Page: 2049
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
8-Smithee
|
Journal Page: 2048
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
7-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 2045
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
3-D. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 2039
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2036
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#368
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|