Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1130 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2064 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1955 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Record vote | RV#378 | Journal Page: 1955 |
House | 04/27/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1955 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1955 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1909 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1909 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1909 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1706 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Pensions | Journal Page: 914 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 914 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Filed |