Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3230 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Rodriguez of Bexar, Minjarez, Guillen H.B. No. 3230
 (Senate Sponsor - Campbell)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 20, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 12,
 Nays 0; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the determination of eligible costs and expenses for
 purposes of the franchise tax credit for the rehabilitation of
 historic structures.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 171.901(4), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (4)  "Eligible costs and expenses" means qualified
 rehabilitation expenditures as defined by Section 47(c)(2),
 Internal Revenue Code, except that the depreciation and tax-exempt
 use provisions of that section do not apply to costs and expenses
 incurred by an entity exempt from the tax imposed under this chapter
 by Section 171.063, and those costs and expenses are eligible costs
 and expenses if the other provisions of Section 47(c)(2), Internal
 Revenue Code, are satisfied.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to a report originally due
 on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 * * * * *