Senate | 05/19/2015 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1692 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1692 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1260 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2344 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2150 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2147 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | RV#448 | Journal Page: 2150 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2150 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2150 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2130 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2130 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1551 | |
House | 04/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 915 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 915 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed |