Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB324 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2015

                    By: Dutton, Simpson, Wu (Senate Sponsor - Burton) H.B. No. 324
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 22, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 324 By:  Burton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that a peace officer obtain a search
 warrant before conducting a body cavity search during a traffic
 stop.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 18, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 18.24 to read as follows:
 Art. 18.24.  BODY CAVITY SEARCH DURING TRAFFIC STOP. (a) In
 this article, "body cavity search" means an inspection that is
 conducted of a person's anal or vaginal cavity in any manner, but
 the term does not include a pat-down.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, a peace officer may not
 conduct a body cavity search of a person during a traffic stop
 unless the officer first obtains a search warrant pursuant to this
 chapter authorizing the body cavity search.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *