LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB324
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB324
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB324
Compare Versions
HB324 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB324 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB324 Enrolled May 29, 2015
HB324 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB324 Engrossed April 28, 2015
HB324 Comm Sub March 31, 2015
HB324 Introduced November 18, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
HB324 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB324 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB324 Enrolled May 29, 2015
HB324 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB324 Engrossed April 28, 2015
HB324 Comm Sub March 31, 2015
HB324 Introduced November 18, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare