Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3271 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/13/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Guillen H.B. No. 3271


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a deer management program commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 63, Texas Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended by adding Section 63.003, to read as follows:
 Section 63.003.  DEER MANAGEMENT COMMISSION. (a) In this
 section:
 (1)  "Commission" means the deer management
 commission;
 (2)  "Deer" means a white-tailed deer or mule deer;
 (3)  "Department" means the Parks and Wildlife
 Department.
 (b)  The commission is composed of the following nineteen
 members:
 (1)  two veterinarians who are members of the Texas
 Deer Association, one whom shall be appointed by the speaker of the
 house of representatives and one whom shall be appointed by the
 lieutenant governor;
 (2)  two wildlife biologists who are members of the
 Texas Deer Association, one whom shall be appointed by the speaker
 of the house of representatives and one whom shall be appointed by
 the lieutenant governor;
 (3)  two veterinarians who are members of the Texas
 Wildlife Association, one whom shall be appointed by the speaker of
 the house of representatives and one whom shall be appointed by the
 lieutenant governor;
 (3)  two wildlife biologists who are members of the
 Texas Wildlife Association, one whom shall be appointed by the
 speaker of the house of representatives and one whom shall be
 appointed by the lieutenant governor;
 (4)  two representatives from the Texas Parks and
 Wildlife Department;
 (4)  two representatives from the Texas Animal Health
 Commission;
 (5)  two representatives from Texas A&M University, one
 whom shall be appointed by the speaker of the house of
 representatives and one whom shall be appointed by the lieutenant
 governor;
 (6)  two representatives of Texas A&M University -
 Kingsville, one whom shall be appointed by the speaker of the house
 of representatives and one whom shall be appointed by the
 lieutenant governor;
 (7)  two representatives of Texas Tech University, one
 whom shall be appointed by the speaker of the house of
 representatives and one whom shall be appointed by the lieutenant
 governor; and
 (8)  the governor shall appoint a member of the public
 who has demonstrated a high knowledge of deer management to serve as
 the chair of the commission.  The chair may not be a member of the
 Texas Deer Association or the Texas Wildlife Association.
 (c)  The commission shall study and make recommendations
 regarding deer management practices for both white-tailed and mule
 deer, including:
 (1)  study and determine exact pharmaceutical
 withdrawal periods;
 (2)  study and develop guidelines for the denial and
 review of deer breeder permits;
 (3)  study and recommend practices for the
 identification of breeder deer;
 (4)  study and recommend practices for captivity of
 breeder deer;
 (5)  study and recommend practices for the transfer of
 breeder deer;
 (6)  study and recommend practices for the sale of game
 meat;
 (7)  study and recommend practices for the trapping of
 deer;
 (8)  recommend guidelines for the notification and
 appeal process regarding the depopulation of some or all of a deer
 breeder's herd; and
 (9)  recommend a date for the release of breeder deer
 prior to an open hunting season.
 (d)  A commission member is not entitled to compensation for
 the services provided as a commission member.  A commission member
 may receive reimbursement for the member's actual and necessary
 expenses incurred in performing commission duties.
 (e)  The Texas Parks and Wildlife Department and the Texas
 Animal Health Commission shall use existing resources to conduct
 the study.
 (f)  The commission may solicit and accept donations from
 private and public sources for the purpose of this section.
 (g)  The commission shall meet at the call of the presiding
 officer and may hold additional meetings by telephone conference
 call if necessary.
 (h)  The commission shall hold at least three public hearings
 in locations selected by the commission to provide interested
 persons an opportunity to appear and speak on any subject relating
 to the powers and duties of the commission.
 (i)  Not later than January 1, 2017, the commission shall
 provide the department, the legislature, and the governor, a final
 report on deer management recommendations.
 (j)  Not later than January 1, 2019, the commission shall
 provide the department, the legislature, and the governor, a final
 report on the implementation of deer management practices.
 (k)  This Section expires and the commission is abolished on
 June 1, 2019.
 (l)  Not later than December 1, 2015, the governor shall
 appoint the chair of the commission, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and the lieutenant governor shall appoint the
 members of the commission created under this section.
 (m)  The commission is subject to Chapters 551 and 552,
 Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.