1 | 1 | | By: Guillen H.B. No. 3271 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
5 | 5 | | AN ACT |
---|
6 | 6 | | relating to the creation of a deer management program commission. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 63, Texas Parks and Wildlife Code, is |
---|
9 | 9 | | amended by adding Section 63.003, to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | Section 63.003. DEER MANAGEMENT COMMISSION. (a) In this |
---|
11 | 11 | | section: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (1) "Commission" means the deer management |
---|
13 | 13 | | commission; |
---|
14 | 14 | | (2) "Deer" means a white-tailed deer or mule deer; |
---|
15 | 15 | | (3) "Department" means the Parks and Wildlife |
---|
16 | 16 | | Department. |
---|
17 | 17 | | (b) The commission is composed of the following nineteen |
---|
18 | 18 | | members: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (1) two veterinarians who are members of the Texas |
---|
20 | 20 | | Deer Association, one whom shall be appointed by the speaker of the |
---|
21 | 21 | | house of representatives and one whom shall be appointed by the |
---|
22 | 22 | | lieutenant governor; |
---|
23 | 23 | | (2) two wildlife biologists who are members of the |
---|
24 | 24 | | Texas Deer Association, one whom shall be appointed by the speaker |
---|
25 | 25 | | of the house of representatives and one whom shall be appointed by |
---|
26 | 26 | | the lieutenant governor; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (3) two veterinarians who are members of the Texas |
---|
28 | 28 | | Wildlife Association, one whom shall be appointed by the speaker of |
---|
29 | 29 | | the house of representatives and one whom shall be appointed by the |
---|
30 | 30 | | lieutenant governor; |
---|
31 | 31 | | (3) two wildlife biologists who are members of the |
---|
32 | 32 | | Texas Wildlife Association, one whom shall be appointed by the |
---|
33 | 33 | | speaker of the house of representatives and one whom shall be |
---|
34 | 34 | | appointed by the lieutenant governor; |
---|
35 | 35 | | (4) two representatives from the Texas Parks and |
---|
36 | 36 | | Wildlife Department; |
---|
37 | 37 | | (4) two representatives from the Texas Animal Health |
---|
38 | 38 | | Commission; |
---|
39 | 39 | | (5) two representatives from Texas A&M University, one |
---|
40 | 40 | | whom shall be appointed by the speaker of the house of |
---|
41 | 41 | | representatives and one whom shall be appointed by the lieutenant |
---|
42 | 42 | | governor; |
---|
43 | 43 | | (6) two representatives of Texas A&M University - |
---|
44 | 44 | | Kingsville, one whom shall be appointed by the speaker of the house |
---|
45 | 45 | | of representatives and one whom shall be appointed by the |
---|
46 | 46 | | lieutenant governor; |
---|
47 | 47 | | (7) two representatives of Texas Tech University, one |
---|
48 | 48 | | whom shall be appointed by the speaker of the house of |
---|
49 | 49 | | representatives and one whom shall be appointed by the lieutenant |
---|
50 | 50 | | governor; and |
---|
51 | 51 | | (8) the governor shall appoint a member of the public |
---|
52 | 52 | | who has demonstrated a high knowledge of deer management to serve as |
---|
53 | 53 | | the chair of the commission. The chair may not be a member of the |
---|
54 | 54 | | Texas Deer Association or the Texas Wildlife Association. |
---|
55 | 55 | | (c) The commission shall study and make recommendations |
---|
56 | 56 | | regarding deer management practices for both white-tailed and mule |
---|
57 | 57 | | deer, including: |
---|
58 | 58 | | (1) study and determine exact pharmaceutical |
---|
59 | 59 | | withdrawal periods; |
---|
60 | 60 | | (2) study and develop guidelines for the denial and |
---|
61 | 61 | | review of deer breeder permits; |
---|
62 | 62 | | (3) study and recommend practices for the |
---|
63 | 63 | | identification of breeder deer; |
---|
64 | 64 | | (4) study and recommend practices for captivity of |
---|
65 | 65 | | breeder deer; |
---|
66 | 66 | | (5) study and recommend practices for the transfer of |
---|
67 | 67 | | breeder deer; |
---|
68 | 68 | | (6) study and recommend practices for the sale of game |
---|
69 | 69 | | meat; |
---|
70 | 70 | | (7) study and recommend practices for the trapping of |
---|
71 | 71 | | deer; |
---|
72 | 72 | | (8) recommend guidelines for the notification and |
---|
73 | 73 | | appeal process regarding the depopulation of some or all of a deer |
---|
74 | 74 | | breeder's herd; and |
---|
75 | 75 | | (9) recommend a date for the release of breeder deer |
---|
76 | 76 | | prior to an open hunting season. |
---|
77 | 77 | | (d) A commission member is not entitled to compensation for |
---|
78 | 78 | | the services provided as a commission member. A commission member |
---|
79 | 79 | | may receive reimbursement for the member's actual and necessary |
---|
80 | 80 | | expenses incurred in performing commission duties. |
---|
81 | 81 | | (e) The Texas Parks and Wildlife Department and the Texas |
---|
82 | 82 | | Animal Health Commission shall use existing resources to conduct |
---|
83 | 83 | | the study. |
---|
84 | 84 | | (f) The commission may solicit and accept donations from |
---|
85 | 85 | | private and public sources for the purpose of this section. |
---|
86 | 86 | | (g) The commission shall meet at the call of the presiding |
---|
87 | 87 | | officer and may hold additional meetings by telephone conference |
---|
88 | 88 | | call if necessary. |
---|
89 | 89 | | (h) The commission shall hold at least three public hearings |
---|
90 | 90 | | in locations selected by the commission to provide interested |
---|
91 | 91 | | persons an opportunity to appear and speak on any subject relating |
---|
92 | 92 | | to the powers and duties of the commission. |
---|
93 | 93 | | (i) Not later than January 1, 2017, the commission shall |
---|
94 | 94 | | provide the department, the legislature, and the governor, a final |
---|
95 | 95 | | report on deer management recommendations. |
---|
96 | 96 | | (j) Not later than January 1, 2019, the commission shall |
---|
97 | 97 | | provide the department, the legislature, and the governor, a final |
---|
98 | 98 | | report on the implementation of deer management practices. |
---|
99 | 99 | | (k) This Section expires and the commission is abolished on |
---|
100 | 100 | | June 1, 2019. |
---|
101 | 101 | | (l) Not later than December 1, 2015, the governor shall |
---|
102 | 102 | | appoint the chair of the commission, the speaker of the house of |
---|
103 | 103 | | representatives, and the lieutenant governor shall appoint the |
---|
104 | 104 | | members of the commission created under this section. |
---|
105 | 105 | | (m) The commission is subject to Chapters 551 and 552, |
---|
106 | 106 | | Government Code. |
---|
107 | 107 | | SECTION 2. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect |
---|
108 | 108 | | immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members |
---|
109 | 109 | | elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas |
---|
110 | 110 | | Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
111 | 111 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|