Senate | 05/20/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1554 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3143 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#922 | Journal Page: 3142 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3142 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3142 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3030 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3030 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Amendment adopted as amended | 1-Dutton | Journal Page: 3030 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Amendment amended | 2-Burkett | Journal Page: 3030 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Dutton | Journal Page: 3026 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3026 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Postponed | 5/11/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2961 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2961 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2268 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 779 | |
House | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 779 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed |