Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3282 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R25888 GCB-F
 By: Simmons, Farney H.B. No. 3282
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 3282:
 By:  Aycock C.S.H.B. No. 3282


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the coordination of, communication of best practices
 concerning, and collection of information pertaining to the
 provision of evidence-based behavioral services for students with
 autism spectrum disorder in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 61, Education Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter P to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER P. AUTISM SERVICES
 Sec. 61.781.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "autism
 program" means:
 (1)  a public entity that provides evidence-based
 behavioral services, including applied behavior analysis services
 for children with autism spectrum disorder; and
 (2)  an autism research center at a public or private
 institution of higher education that provides evidence-based
 behavioral services, including applied behavior analysis services
 for children with autism spectrum disorder, under a grant contract
 with the board.
 Sec. 61.782.  COORDINATION OF SERVICES; COMMUNICATION ON
 BEST PRACTICES. (a)  The board shall ensure communication and
 coordination among the board, autism programs, school districts,
 the Department of Assistive and Rehabilitative Services, and other
 state agencies providing evidence-based behavioral services to
 children with autism spectrum disorder in this state regarding best
 practices for delivering those services.
 (b)  An autism program, a school district, the Department of
 Assistive and Rehabilitative Services, or another state agency that
 provides evidence-based behavioral services to children with
 autism spectrum disorder in this state shall comply with a request
 for information concerning the provision of those services made by
 the board for the purpose of complying with this subchapter.
 Sec. 61.783.  STATEWIDE AUTISM DATABASE; REPORT. (a) The
 board shall maintain a statewide autism database of information
 regarding the number of children served through each autism program
 and through each state agency providing evidence-based behavioral
 services to children with autism spectrum disorder in this state,
 the effectiveness of those programs and services, statewide best
 practices for the delivery of those programs and services, and the
 identification of underserved regions of the state with regard to
 those programs and services.
 (b)  Annually, the board shall submit to the legislature a
 report on the information maintained in the database.
 (c)  The board may not include in the database personal
 information of any kind pertaining to a child receiving services
 from an autism program or a state agency or pertaining to the
 child's family.
 (d)  The board shall make the database readily accessible
 online.
 Sec. 61.784.  RULES.  The board shall adopt rules as
 necessary for the administration of this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  SELECT COMMITTEES ON AUTISM SERVICES. (a) Not
 later than November 30, 2015:
 (1)  the speaker of the house of representatives shall
 appoint to a House Select Committee on Statewide Coordination of
 Autism Services seven members with one member designated as chair;
 and
 (2)  the lieutenant governor shall appoint to a Senate
 Select Committee on Statewide Coordination of Autism Services five
 members with one member designated as chair.
 (b)  The committees established under this section may meet
 separately at the call of the chair of the committee or jointly at
 the call of both chairs. In joint meetings, the chairs shall act as
 joint chairs.
 (c)  The committees established under this section, meeting
 separately or jointly, shall review, study, and evaluate:
 (1)  autism service programs in other states;
 (2)  university programs in this state that provide
 autism treatment and services;
 (3)  community agencies and organizations that provide
 applied behavioral analysis (ABA) services;
 (4)  ways to improve communication and coordination
 among entities providing autism services across the state;
 (5)  areas of the state that are most underserved with
 regard to autism services; and
 (6)  ways to provide autism services to more children.
 (d)  Following consideration of the factors described by
 Subsection (c) of this section, the committees established under
 this section shall jointly adopt recommendations related to the
 reviewed topics and shall provide a written report to the
 legislature of the committees' recommendations for legislative or
 other action not later than January 13, 2017.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.