Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1501
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1501
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1466
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#760
|
Journal Page: 2843
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2843
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2843
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2727
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#728
|
Journal Page: 2727
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2727
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Larson
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|