E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5414
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1706
|
Journal Page: 5414
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5414
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4983
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2564
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2564
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2564
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2564
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2564
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2564
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2564
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1536
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1536
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1466
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#761
|
Journal Page: 2845
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2845
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Darby
|
Journal Page: 2845
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2845
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2729
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Amended
|
2-Darby
|
Journal Page: 2729
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2728
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|