House | 05/14/2015 | Postponed | 5/15/15 12:01 AM | Journal Page: 3535 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amended | 4-Hernandez | Journal Page: 3534 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3534 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Record vote | RV#1108 | Journal Page: 3533 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Motion to table fails | 2-Schaefer | Journal Page: 3533 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3533 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Postponed | 5/13/15 7:00 PM | Journal Page: 3352 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | 2-Schaefer | Journal Page: 3350 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | 1-Rinaldi | Journal Page: 3349 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3349 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Postponed | 5/13/15 3:00 PM | Journal Page: 3031 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3031 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Postponed | 5/11/15 2:00 PM | Journal Page: 2424 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2424 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1944 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 783 | |
House | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 783 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed |