Senate | 05/05/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1337 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1337 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 809 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1540 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Record vote | RV#213 | Journal Page: 1539 |
House | 04/14/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1539 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1539 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1525 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Record vote | RV#205 | Journal Page: 1524 |
House | 04/13/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1524 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Amendment tabled | 1-Shaheen | Journal Page: 1523 |
House | 04/13/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1523 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1374 | |
House | 03/31/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 783 | |
House | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 783 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed |