House | 05/12/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 1578 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 1578 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 853 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 853 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed |