Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3354 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/12/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R10830 CBH-F
 By: Bohac H.B. No. 3354


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of certain unused franchise tax credits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 18, Chapter 1 (H.B. 3), Acts of the 79th
 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, 2006, is amended by adding
 Subsections (h-1), (i-1), (j), and (k) to read as follows:
 (h-1)  In this subsection and Subsection (i-1) of this
 section, "transfer" includes a sale. Notwithstanding Subsections
 (e) and (f) of this section and subject to Subsection (k) of this
 section, a corporation that had unused credits before January 1,
 2008, under former Subchapter P or Q, Chapter 171, Tax Code, that
 expired under the terms of one of those former subchapters or under
 Subsection (e) or (f) of this section, may transfer the right to the
 expired credits to another taxpayer of this state. A transferred
 credit is considered to be newly established by the taxpayer to
 which the credit is transferred on the date the transfer is
 complete. To be eligible to transfer the credits, the corporation
 must obtain a certificate of transfer of credit from the
 comptroller for the amount of the credits to be transferred. Not
 later than the 30th day after the date of the transfer, the
 corporation must submit to the comptroller a notice of the transfer
 in a form prescribed by the comptroller. The notice must be
 accompanied by a copy of the certificate of transfer issued by the
 comptroller and specify:
 (1)  the number on the certificate of transfer;
 (2)  the amount of the corporation's unused credits
 preceding the transfer;
 (3)  the date of the transfer;
 (4)  the amount of credits transferred;
 (5)  the tax identification numbers of the corporation
 and the taxpayer to which the credits were transferred;
 (6)  the corporation's remaining amount of unused
 credits after the transfer; and
 (7)  any other information the comptroller requires.
 (i-1)  The transfer of a credit under Subsection (h-1) of
 this section is limited to an unused credit for which the
 corporation was eligible before January 1, 2008, and does not
 include credits authorized under former Subchapter Q-1, Chapter
 171, Tax Code, or credits that were created under the terms of a
 written agreement between a taxpayer and the Texas Department of
 Economic Development or its successor that was entered into before
 June 1, 2006, and that continue to accrue under the terms provided
 by Section 19 of this Act. The transferee of a credit under this
 section obtains the credit subject to the same rights and
 privileges as the transferor had on the date the credit was
 originally established. The transfer of a credit under Subsection
 (h-1) of this section does not extend or lessen the period during
 which the credit may be claimed after the credit is newly
 established by the taxpayer to which the credit is transferred as
 provided by that subsection. If a corporation transfers a credit
 that the corporation was not entitled to transfer at the time of the
 transfer:
 (1)  the taxpayer to which the credit was transferred
 may pursue any remedy authorized by law against the corporation and
 may not pursue any remedy against the comptroller or this state; and
 (2)  the comptroller:
 (A)  may not allow the taxpayer to which the
 credit was transferred to apply the credit on a report for a tax
 listed in Subsection (j) of this section; or
 (B)  shall recover from the taxpayer the amount of
 the credit the taxpayer claims on a report using any means
 authorized by law.
 (j)  A taxpayer to which a credit is transferred under
 Subsection (h-1) of this section may apply the credit against:
 (1)  the taxes due under Chapters 151, 152, 154, 155,
 156, 158, 160, 161, 162, 171, 181, 182, 183, 191, 201, 202, and 203,
 Tax Code; and
 (2)  a contribution due under Subtitle A, Title 4,
 Labor Code.
 (k)  A corporation may not transfer an unused tax credit
 under Subsection (h-1) of this section after August 31, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to a report originally due
 on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.