Senate | 05/15/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1624 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1624 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3548 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3273 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Record vote | RV#986 | Journal Page: 3273 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3273 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 3272 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration | Journal Page: 3261 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#929 | Journal Page: 3149 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Failed to pass | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3149 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3040 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3040 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Amended | 2-Y. Davis | Journal Page: 3040 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3039 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2064 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 786 | |
House | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 786 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed |