22 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
23 | 5 | | relating to level of care designations for hospitals that provide |
---|
24 | 6 | | neonatal and maternal care. |
---|
25 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
26 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Sections 241.187(b), (d), and (j), Health and |
---|
27 | 9 | | Safety Code, as added by Chapter 217 (H.B. 15), Acts of the 83rd |
---|
28 | 10 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
29 | 11 | | (b) The advisory council consists of 19 [17] members |
---|
30 | 12 | | appointed by the executive commissioner as follows: |
---|
31 | 13 | | (1) four physicians licensed to practice medicine |
---|
32 | 14 | | under Subtitle B, Title 3, Occupations Code, specializing in |
---|
33 | 15 | | neonatology: |
---|
34 | 16 | | (A) at least two of whom practice in a Level III |
---|
35 | 17 | | or IV neonatal intensive care unit; and |
---|
36 | 18 | | (B) at least one of whom practices in a neonatal |
---|
37 | 19 | | intensive care unit of a hospital located in a rural area; |
---|
38 | 20 | | (2) one physician licensed to practice medicine under |
---|
39 | 21 | | Subtitle B, Title 3, Occupations Code, specializing in general |
---|
40 | 22 | | pediatrics; |
---|
41 | 23 | | (3) two physicians licensed to practice medicine under |
---|
42 | 24 | | Subtitle B, Title 3, Occupations Code, specializing in |
---|
43 | 25 | | obstetrics-gynecology; |
---|
44 | 26 | | (4) two physicians licensed to practice medicine under |
---|
45 | 27 | | Subtitle B, Title 3, Occupations Code, specializing in maternal |
---|
46 | 28 | | fetal medicine; |
---|
47 | 29 | | (5) two physicians [one physician] licensed to |
---|
48 | 30 | | practice medicine under Subtitle B, Title 3, Occupations Code, |
---|
49 | 31 | | specializing in family practice who provide [provides] obstetrical |
---|
50 | 32 | | care in a rural community, at least one of whom must provide such |
---|
51 | 33 | | care at a hospital that has 50 or fewer patient beds and that is: |
---|
52 | 34 | | (A) located in a county with a population of |
---|
53 | 35 | | 60,000 or less; or |
---|
54 | 36 | | (B) designated by the Centers for Medicare and |
---|
55 | 37 | | Medicaid Services as a critical access hospital, rural referral |
---|
56 | 38 | | center, or sole community hospital; |
---|
57 | 39 | | (6) one registered nurse licensed under Subtitle E, |
---|
58 | 40 | | Title 3, Occupations Code, with expertise in maternal health care |
---|
59 | 41 | | delivery; |
---|
60 | 42 | | (7) one registered nurse licensed under Subtitle E, |
---|
61 | 43 | | Title 3, Occupations Code, with expertise in perinatal health care |
---|
62 | 44 | | delivery; |
---|
63 | 45 | | (8) one representative from a children's hospital; |
---|
64 | 46 | | (9) one representative from a hospital with a Level II |
---|
65 | 47 | | neonatal intensive care unit; |
---|
66 | 48 | | (10) two representatives [one representative] from a |
---|
67 | 49 | | rural hospital, at least one of whom must be an administrative |
---|
68 | 50 | | representative from a hospital that has 50 or fewer patient beds and |
---|
69 | 51 | | that is: |
---|
70 | 52 | | (A) located in a county with a population of |
---|
71 | 53 | | 60,000 or less; or |
---|
72 | 54 | | (B) designated by the Centers for Medicare and |
---|
73 | 55 | | Medicaid Services as a critical access hospital, rural referral |
---|
74 | 56 | | center, or sole community hospital; |
---|
75 | 57 | | (11) one representative from a general hospital; and |
---|
76 | 58 | | (12) one ex officio representative from the office of |
---|
77 | 59 | | the medical director of the Health and Human Services Commission. |
---|
78 | 60 | | (d) Members of the advisory council described by |
---|
79 | 61 | | Subsections (b)(1)-(11) serve staggered three-year terms, with the |
---|
80 | 62 | | terms of [five or] six of those members expiring September 1 of each |
---|
81 | 63 | | year. A member may be reappointed to the advisory council. |
---|
82 | 64 | | (j) The advisory council shall submit a report detailing the |
---|
83 | 65 | | advisory council's determinations and recommendations to the |
---|
84 | 66 | | department and the executive commissioner not later than September |
---|
85 | 67 | | 1, 2016 [2015]. |
---|
86 | 68 | | SECTION 2. Notwithstanding Section 241.187, Health and |
---|
87 | 69 | | Safety Code, as added by Chapter 217 (H.B. 15), Acts of the 83rd |
---|
88 | 70 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, and as amended by this Act, of |
---|
89 | 71 | | the two additional persons appointed to the Perinatal Advisory |
---|
90 | 72 | | Council by this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and |
---|
91 | 73 | | Human Services Commission shall appoint the additional member |
---|
92 | 74 | | described by Section 241.187(b)(5), Health and Safety Code, to an |
---|
93 | 75 | | initial term that expires September 1, 2019, and the additional |
---|
94 | 76 | | member described by Section 241.187(b)(10), Health and Safety Code, |
---|
95 | 77 | | to an initial term that expires September 1, 2017. The executive |
---|
96 | 78 | | commissioner shall make the appointments not later than October 1, |
---|
97 | 79 | | 2015. |
---|
98 | 80 | | SECTION 3. Notwithstanding Section 2, Chapter 217 (H.B. |
---|
99 | 81 | | 15), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular Session, 2013: |
---|
100 | 82 | | (1) the executive commissioner of the Health and Human |
---|
101 | 83 | | Services Commission shall adopt the initial rules required by |
---|
102 | 84 | | Section 241.183, Health and Safety Code, as added by Chapter 217 |
---|
103 | 85 | | (H.B. 15), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, not |
---|
104 | 86 | | later than March 1, 2018, after consideration of the report of the |
---|
105 | 87 | | Perinatal Advisory Council; |
---|
106 | 88 | | (2) the executive commissioner of the Health and Human |
---|
107 | 89 | | Services Commission shall complete for each hospital in this state: |
---|
108 | 90 | | (A) the neonatal level of care designation not |
---|
109 | 91 | | later than August 31, 2018; and |
---|
110 | 92 | | (B) the maternal level of care designation not |
---|
111 | 93 | | later than August 31, 2020; and |
---|
112 | 94 | | (3) a hospital is not required to have: |
---|
113 | 95 | | (A) a neonatal level of care designation as a |
---|
114 | 96 | | condition of reimbursement for neonatal services through the |
---|
115 | 97 | | Medicaid program before September 1, 2018; and |
---|
116 | 98 | | (B) a maternal level of care designation as a |
---|
117 | 99 | | condition of reimbursement for maternal services through the |
---|
118 | 100 | | Medicaid program before September 1, 2020. |
---|
119 | 101 | | SECTION 4. If before implementing any provision of this Act |
---|
120 | 102 | | a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a |
---|
121 | 103 | | federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, |
---|
122 | 104 | | the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or |
---|
123 | 105 | | authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the |
---|
124 | 106 | | waiver or authorization is granted. |
---|
125 | 107 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
126 | 108 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
127 | 109 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
128 | 110 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
129 | 111 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|