House | 05/11/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3026 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1108 | Journal Page: 3026 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Postponed | 5/11/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2959 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2959 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2267 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 844 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 844 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed |