LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB3474
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB3474
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3474
Compare Versions
HB3474 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3474 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3474 Comm Sub May 23, 2015
HB3474 Engrossed May 6, 2015
HB3474 Comm Sub April 29, 2015
HB3474 Introduced March 12, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB3474 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3474 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3474 Comm Sub May 23, 2015
HB3474 Engrossed May 6, 2015
HB3474 Comm Sub April 29, 2015
HB3474 Introduced March 12, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare