Senate | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1466 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2708 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#713 | Journal Page: 2708 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2708 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2708 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2641 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Amended | 1-Guerra | Journal Page: 2640 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2640 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 845 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 845 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed |